OR HB3044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires business or individual carrying out application of soil treatment or pesticide by aircraft to record information regarding application conditions. Requires business or individual to submit information concerning application to Department of Environmental Quality. Requires department to post information on website. Requires department to send notice to affected properties if department determines that soil treatment or pesticide applied by aircraft drifted beyond property where area targeted for application is located. Authorizes department to assess civil penalty, not to exceed $50,000, for failure to record, falsifying or failing to timely submit information concerning application of soil treatment or pesticide by aircraft or if soil treatment or pesticide applied by aircraft drifts beyond property where area targeted for application is located.
Title
Relating to the application of substances by aircraft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3044 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3044/Introduced |