OR HB3043 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 3, (2021 Laws): Effective date April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that, during statutorily declared emergency, Governor may authorize Director of Department of Revenue to disclose certain information set forth in tax report or return to Director of Employment Department if Director of Department of Revenue determines that administration of any federal or state law or program requires disclosure to enable Employment Department to verify identity or income level of any person for purposes related to emergency or any consequences of emergency. Changes alternative amount from $300 to 23 times minimum wage in effect in Metro for determination of earnings disregard for purposes of unemployment insurance benefits.] Creates alternative maximum amount of 23 times minimum wage in effect in Metro that individual may receive in part-time remuneration and still be deemed "unemployed" for purposes of unemployment insurance benefits.] Provides that, during statutorily declared emergency, Governor may authorize Director of Department of Revenue to disclose certain information set forth in tax report or return to Director of Employment Department if Director of Department of Revenue determines that administration of any federal or state law or program requires disclosure to enable Employment Department to verify identity or income level of any person for purposes related to emergency or any consequences of emergency. Ratifies disclosures made by Director of Department of Revenue in compliance with identical provision enacted by section 1, chapter 2, Oregon Laws 2020 (second special session), on or after date of sunset of section 1, chapter 2, Oregon Laws 2020 (second special session), and before effective date of this Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unemployment insurance benefits; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 3, (2021 Laws): Effective date April 15, 2021.
2021-04-15HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-05SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Gelser, Girod, Thomsen.
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-03-30SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-19SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2021-03-17SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-03-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Evans, Leif, Rayfield, Reardon, Zika.
2021-03-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 16, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-09HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-03HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2021-01-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3043
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3043/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3043/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3043/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3043/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31293
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=504647
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31636
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=512301

Bill Comments

feedback