OR HB3040 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 544, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 544, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Housing and Community Services Department, in consultation with Department of Land Conservation and Development, Department of Environmental Quality, Department of Revenue and Oregon Business Development Department, to conduct comprehensive study of system development charges. Directs Housing and Community Services Department, in consultation with Department of Land Conservation and Development, Department of Environmental Quality, Department of Revenue and Oregon Business Development Department, to conduct comprehensive study of system development charges. Requires Housing and Community Services Department to submit, to interim legislative committees related to housing and economic recovery and prosperity, preliminary report no later than December 31, 2021, and final report no later than June 1, 2022. Requires city, county or special district that maintains public website to include certain information regarding system development charges in manner readily accessible to general public. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to system development charges; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 544, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Burdick, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2021-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |