OR HB3039 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Health Information Technology Oversight Council to convene one or more groups of stakeholders and experts to explore specified issues related to adoption of secure, statewide, integrated health information and community information exchanges. Requires Oregon Health Authority, in coordination with Department of Human Services,] Health Information Technology Oversight Council to convene one or more groups of stakeholders and experts to study and make recommendations regarding electronic referral system for social services and statewide health information exchange] explore specified issues related to adoption of secure, statewide, integrated health information and community information exchanges. Requires authority] council to report findings and recommendations] to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health and human services no later than October 1, 2022, and January 31, 2023, on findings of stakeholder groups and recommendations for legislative changes, if needed, to implement statewide health information and community information exchanges. Sunsets January 2] February 28, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to human services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |