OR HB3039 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority, in coordination with Department of Human Services, to convene one or more groups of stakeholders and experts to study and make recommendations regarding electronic referral system for social services and statewide health information exchange. Requires Oregon Health Authority, in coordination with Department of Human Services, to convene one or more groups of stakeholders and experts to study and make recommendations regarding electronic referral system for social services and statewide health information exchange. Requires authority to report findings and recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health and human services. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to human services; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2021-04-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-04-07HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-01-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback