OR HB3037 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 185, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 185, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs medical examiner or medical-legal death investigator to report deaths of decedents 24 years of age or younger to local mental health authority if district medical examiner, assistant district medical examiner, pathologist or designee of district medical examiner reasonably believes manner of death was suicide. Directs medical examiner or medical-legal death investigator to report suspected suicides involving] deaths of decedents 24 years of age or younger to local mental health authority if district medical examiner, assistant district medical examiner, pathologist or designee of district medical examiner reasonably believes manner of death was suicide. Directs Oregon Health Authority to develop statewide suicide post-intervention protocol. Authorizes cross-reporting between local mental health authorities. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to youth suicide response; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 185, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Cate, Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Carried over to March 24, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Carried over to March 22, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |