OR HB3036 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 349, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 349, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows physician assistant to register with Oregon Medical Board for authority to dispense prescription drugs. Allows physician assistant to register with Oregon Medical Board for authority to dispense prescription drugs. Specifies requirements for dispensation by physician assistant. Allows board to license out-of-state physician assistant to practice medicine in Oregon. Becomes operative January 15, 2022. Removes requirement that physician assistant practice under supervising physician. Requires physician assistant to enter into collaboration agreement with physician, podiatric physician or employer. Defines "collaboration agreement." Becomes operative July 15, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to physician assistants; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 349, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill, to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Prusak, Moore-Green. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Holvey, Hudson, Rayfield, Reardon, Smith G; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Drazan, Evans, Lewis. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |