OR HB3033 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes county with population of less than 15,000 to adopt property tax exemption for newly constructed single-family dwellings built and occupied as primary residences by individuals with annual taxable income of not more than $125,000 if filing separately or not more than $250,000 if filing jointly. Authorizes county with population of less than 15,000 to adopt property tax exemption for newly constructed single-family dwellings built and occupied as primary residences by individuals with annual taxable income of not more than $125,000 if filing separately or not more than $250,000 if filing jointly. Requires county to prescribe application forms for precertification process and exemption. Limits new exemptions to no more than five dwellings per county per property tax year. Allows county to determine length of exemption, between three and five years. Prohibits new exemptions for property tax years beginning on or after July 1, 2032. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a property tax exemption for workforce housing; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2021-01-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback