OR HB3031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates family and medical leave insurance program to provide employee who is eligible for coverage with portion of wages while employee is on family and medical leave or military family leave. Requires employer and employee contributions to fund program. Allows self-employed individuals and tribal government employers to opt into program. Directs Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to determine contribution amounts and weekly benefit amounts. Establishes Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Consumer and Business Services for purposes of Act. Protects eligible employee's position of employment with employer while employee is on leave if employee has been employed with employer for minimum of 90 days before commencing leave. Prohibits employer from retaliating against employee who invokes program and from interfering with employee rights under program. Establishes right of employee for civil action for certain employer violations. Amends Oregon family leave law to allow for leave after employee has been employed for 90 days with employer and to extend length of leave taken for bereavement. Directs department to administer collection of, and reporting requirements for, payroll contributions. Requires director to work with other agencies and promulgate rules for administration of program. Establishes requirements for director to submit initial report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2021. Beginning September 15, 2022, requires director to report to committees on September 15 of every even-numbered year thereafter. Requires department to conduct study regarding implementation of program with regard to self-employed individuals and tribal governments opting into program. Becomes operative on January 1, 2021. Provides that eligibility provisions and provisions related to elective coverage for self-employed individuals and tribal governments become operative on January 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to family medical leave benefits; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-03-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Business and Labor by order of Speaker and then Revenue by prior reference.
2019-03-14HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, be referred to Business and Labor, and then to Revenue by prior reference.
2019-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2019-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback