OR HB3030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Third reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows professional licensing board to issue nonrenewable temporary authorization to spouse of member of Armed Forces of United States stationed in Oregon and who holds eligible out-of-state authorization to provide occupational or professional service. Allows professional licensing board to issue nonrenewable temporary authorization to spouse of member of Armed Forces of United States stationed in Oregon and who holds eligible out-of-state authorization to provide occupational or professional service. Specifies expiration date of temporary authorization. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to professional authorizations; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh.
2019-04-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-16HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2019-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback