OR HB3029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Employment Relations Board to develop guidelines and procedures for authorizations designating bargaining representatives of bargaining unit to be prepared and signed electronically. Requires Employment Relations Board to develop guidelines and procedures for authorizations designating bargaining representatives of bargaining unit to be prepared and signed electronically. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to signed authorizations designating exclusive bargaining representation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3029 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3029/Introduced |