OR HB3026 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 249, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 249, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to waive fee for issuing, renewing or replacing identification card if person who is issued card is experiencing homelessness. Directs Department of Transportation to waive fee for issuing, renewing or replacing identification card if person who is issued card is experiencing homelessness. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to identification card fees; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 249, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan, Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 45; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Salinas. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |