OR HB3025 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Forestry Department to establish Western Oregon Regional Carbon Sink as geographical area and take certain actions regarding area on or before January 1, 2031. Establishes Task Force on Western Oregon Regional Carbon Sink. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2020. Establishes Western Oregon Regional Carbon Sink Advisory Board. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to carbon sequestration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3025 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3025/Introduced |