OR HB3022 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides court with discretion to appoint counsel for child or children in hearings related to domestic relations, custody or support, parentage or habeas corpus. Provides court with discretion to appoint counsel for child or children in hearings related to domestic relations, custody or support, parentage or habeas corpus. Requires child or children to meet with mental health professional prior to appointment of counsel. Provides for reasonable attorney fees and costs. Permits party to move for removal of appointed counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to appointment of counsel for children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-01-29HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law.
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-01-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback