OR HB3016 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 248, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 248, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds requirements for suspension of hospital nurse staffing plan during national or state emergency declaration. Adds requirements for suspension of hospital nurse staffing plan during national or state emergency declaration.
Title
Relating to hospital nurse staffing plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 248, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-09 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Bynum. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 16--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Cate, Drazan, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Weber; Excused, 11--Alonso Leon, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |