OR HB3016 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to State Department of Fish and Wildlife for activities related to summer steelhead hatchery production for Santiam River. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to fish hatcheries; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |