OR HB3015 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Personal Delivery Devices. Establishes Task Force on Personal Delivery Devices. Directs task force to develop and make recommendations for legislation regarding operation of personal delivery devices in this state. Requires task force to submit recommendations to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to personal delivery devices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback