OR HB3015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Board of Higher Education to adopt rules that prohibit public university within Oregon University System from providing information about student enrolled in public university to person that is engaged in business of extending or offering to extend credit by means of credit card unless student gives public university express written consent and from advertising or permitting another person to advertise any offer to extend credit by means of credit card in official publication
Title
Relating to credit offers to students enrolled in public universities.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Gallegos [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |