OR HB3013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers oversight and regulation of medical marijuana processing sites and medical marijuana dispensaries from Oregon Health Authority to Oregon Liquor Control Commission. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to study regulation of cannabis. Requires report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to economic development.] Sunsets January 2, 2022.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Transfers oversight and regulation of medical marijuana processing sites and medical marijuana dispensaries from Oregon Health Authority to Oregon Liquor Control Commission. Directs commission to establish by rule process to register medical marijuana processing sites and medical marijuana dispensaries. Establishes civil penalty for certain violations. Directs commission to adopt rules to support marijuana plant diversity by allowing qualified marijuana producers to receive marijuana seeds from sources in state. Directs State Department of Agriculture to adopt rules to require industrial hemp grower to report to department loss of crop or intention to not plant industrial hemp crop. Requires grower ordered to destroy or remediate specified industrial hemp crop to provide documentation to department of destruction or remediation. Directs department to take specified actions if person plants industrial hemp crop prior to applying for grower registration. Establishes civil penalty not to exceed $10,000 applicable to certain persons for industrial hemp crop that contains specified tetrahydrocannabinol concentration. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to regulation of cannabis; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried. Referred. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |