OR HB3008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 211, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 211, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employer from requiring employee to create, file or sign documents containing information that employer knows is false related to hours worked or compensation received by employee. Prohibits employer from requiring employee to create, file or sign documents containing information that employer knows is false related to hours worked or compensation received by employee. Establishes private cause of action. Authorizes court to award statutory damages of $1,000 or more per violation, injunctive relief, attorney fees and costs. Authorizes Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to assess civil penalty up to $1,000 per violation.
Title
Relating to false employment records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 211, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum; excused, 3--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Carried over to 05-24 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Heard, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Lininger, McKeown. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |