OR HB3008 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires district school board that allows student to attend school of other school district under contract or by giving consent to adopt specified standards for admittance.
Title
Relating to admittance of nonresident students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Education. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |