OR HB3003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 74, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 74, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to release surety bond or other security on deposit with director if self-insured employer or self-insured employer group obtains paid-up insurance policy satisfactory to director.
Title
Relating to security for liability of self-insured employers in workers' compensation cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 74, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Carried over to 04-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Piluso. |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |