OR HB2998 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Oregon Soil Health Initiative. Creates Oregon Soil Health Initiative. Describes goals] purpose of initiative. Describes responsibilities of state agencies and other entities participating in initiative. Directs Institute for Natural Resources to convene Soil Health Advisory Committee.] Directs institute, in consultation with other entities, to develop Soil Health Roadmap.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to soil health; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] |
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Christine Goodwin [R] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Emerson Levy [D] |
Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] |
Rep. Nathan Sosa [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |