OR HB2998 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 636, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 636, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Business Development Department to provide economic development assistance to persons engaged in business of western juniper harvesting or of manufacturing products from western juniper, provide technical business assistance to western juniper harvesting and related manufacturing businesses and provide or fund workforce training assistance for potential western juniper harvesting and related manufacturing business workers. Requires Institute for Natural Resources to identify and map high quality marketable stands of western juniper. Establishes Western Juniper Industry Fund. Appropriates moneys from General Fund] Establishes expenditure limitation for allocation of lottery moneys to Western Juniper Industry Fund for use by department in carrying out activities regarding western juniper harvesting and related manufacturing businesses during 2015-2017 biennium. Appropriates moneys to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for use by institute in carrying out western juniper stand identification and mapping activities during 2015-2017 biennium. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to western juniper; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Chapter 636, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Carried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 53; Absent, 1--Nosse; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Bentz, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson. |
2015-06-09 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2015-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |