OR HB2997 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue, Oregon Health Authority, Oregon Liquor Control Commission, State Department of Agriculture and Governor's office to consult with Oregon Cannabis Commission and other cannabis entities to develop plan to address issues related to regulatory authority over marijuana. Directs Department of Revenue, Oregon Health Authority, Oregon Liquor Control Commission, State Department of Agriculture and Governor's office to consult with Oregon Cannabis Commission and other cannabis entities to develop plan to address issues related to regulatory authority over marijuana. Requires plan to be submitted to interim committees of Legislative Assembly. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to adopt rules to develop compliance education programs for cannabis entities regulated by commission. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to regulatory authority over marijuana; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2997 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2997/Introduced |