OR HB2997 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 657, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 657, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires person to obtain license to practice direct entry midwifery.
Title
Relating to direct entry midwifery; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 657, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--George. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Parrish. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Bailey, Hicks, Weidner. |
2013-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |