OR HB2996 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Oregon Board of Dentistry from requiring applicant for certification as dental assistant to pass written examination for radiological proficiency. Prohibits Oregon Board of Dentistry from requiring applicant for certification as dental assistant to pass written examination for radiological proficiency. Prohibits Oregon Health Authority from requiring dental assistant to pass written examination in order to operate X-ray machine. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to dental assistants; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Hai Pham [D] | Rep. Cyrus Javadi [R] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Rep. Emerson Levy [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Pham H, Javadi. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Elmer, Evans, Lewis, Mannix, Morgan, Reschke, Wright; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Levy B, Scharf. |
2023-03-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 16, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-03-14 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |