OR HB2994 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits school board to designate staff member to receive mandatory child abuse reports.
Title
Relating to child abuse reporting.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2994 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2994/Introduced |