OR HB2993 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 463, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 463, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that advisory committees appointed by agency as part of rulemaking must represent interests of persons and communities likely to be affected by rule. Requires agency to appoint advisory committee to represent interests of persons likely to be affected by proposed rule.] Provides that advisory committees appointed by agency as part of rulemaking must represent interests of persons and communities likely to be affected by rule. Requires agency to include in notice of rulemaking statement identifying how adoption of rule will affect racial equity.
Title
Relating to administrative rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Warner [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] |
Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 463, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 15--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 2--Morgan, Wilde. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |