OR HB2993 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies retirement plan options of persons elected or appointed as statewide elected officials or judges. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the retirement benefits of state officers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 21 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to withdraw from Business and Labor failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 36--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused, 3--Barker, Lewis, Sprenger. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |