OR HB2989 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows student enrolled in program provided by school district or education service district to earn General Educational Development (GED) certificate to participate in interscholastic activities. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to students in a program to earn a General Educational Development certificate; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Barbara Warner [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2989 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2989/Introduced |