OR HB2988 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 430, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increases penalty for crime of harassment if offense consists of subjecting another person to offensive physical contact, is committed against family or household member and is committed in immediate presence of or witnessed by minor child in specified circumstances. Increases penalty for crime of harassment if offense consists of subjecting another person to offensive physical contact, is committed against family or household member and is committed in immediate presence of or witnessed by minor child in specified circumstances. Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to classify offense as person Class A misdemeanor under rules of commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13HouseChapter 430, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
2017-06-22HouseGovernor signed.
2017-06-19SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-13HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Alonso Leon, Bynum, Evans, Fahey, Mckeown, Mclain, Meek, Sollman.
2017-06-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bentz, McLane.
2017-06-08SenateVote explanation filed by Prozanski.
2017-06-08SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2017-06-07SenateSecond reading.
2017-06-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-05-31SenateWork Session held.
2017-05-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-04-10SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2017-04-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-04-05HouseThird reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Boone, Clem, Gorsek, Hack, Keny-Guyer.
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading.
2017-04-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2017-03-23HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2017-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2988
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2988/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2988/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2988/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2988/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/24880
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=397387
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26228
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=415149
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=415891

Bill Comments

feedback