OR HB2984 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board for 2017-2019 biennium for issuing grant to Curry County for implementing replacement of control devices at discharge from Floras Lake into Floras Creek. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to watershed preservation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2984 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2984/Introduced |