OR HB2978 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates tax credit for short line railroad rehabilitation projects. Provides for certification and administration] of tax credits by Department of Revenue] Transportation. Limits total amount of potential tax credits available for short line railroad rehabilitation projects in biennium. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to short line railroads; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] |
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2019-06-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |