OR HB2977 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriation to Oregon Health Authority for dental director position. Makes appropriation to Oregon Health Authority for dental director position. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |