OR HB2976 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Spirits Board as semi-independent state agency to develop and promote Oregon's distilled spirits industry. Establishes Oregon Spirits Board as semi-independent state agency to develop and promote Oregon's distilled spirits industry. Imposes 50 cents per bottle surcharge on distilled liquor manufactured in Oregon. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Spirits Board; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Revenue, then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass as amended and be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Revenue, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |