OR HB2976 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission and Department of Veterans' Affairs to adopt by rule additional minimum standards regarding source of tuition revenue for licensing of career schools and schools authorized to confer degrees. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission and Department of Veterans' Affairs to adopt by rule additional minimum standards regarding source of tuition revenue for licensing of career schools that receive $10 million or more in annual revenue or that are subsidiary with parent company] and schools authorized to confer degrees. Establishes different criteria for career schools and schools authorized to confer degrees that collect $1 million or more in annual gross tuition revenue. Establishes civil penalty for violation of standards.
Title
Relating to regulation of post-secondary institutions of education.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Warner [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |