OR HB2975 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to award retail customers of vehicle dealers statutory damages under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-24 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Smith G. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |