OR HB2973 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person 21 years of age or older from possessing more than two ounces of usable marijuana in public place. Prohibits person 21 years of age or older from possessing more than two ounces of usable marijuana in public place. Provides that delivery of not more than two ounces of usable marijuana to person 21 years of age or older is exempt from certain laws regulating marijuana. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to adopt rules in accordance with possession limits. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to marijuana; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2973 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2973/Introduced |