OR HB2973 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Chapter 323, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Chapter 323, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals pilot project requiring Department of Transportation to enter into contract for private maintenance of segment of state highway.
Title
Relating to a pilot project for private maintenance of a segment of a state highway; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Chapter 323, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-31 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--George; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Thatcher, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Jenson, Sprenger. |
2013-04-11 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-10 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2013-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2013-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |