OR HB2972 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Legislative Revenue Officer to study land value taxation and submit report to interim legislative committees related to revenue. Directs Legislative Revenue Officer to study land value taxation and submit report to interim legislative committees related to revenue. Defines "land value taxation" to mean property tax system that imposes higher uniform rate of tax on land assessments than on improvement assessments. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to land value taxation; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2972 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2972/Introduced |