OR HB2968 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 732, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 732, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Chief Education Officer to convene work group to produce report on how State School Fund expenditures relate to educational achievements of students from families in poverty. Directs school districts to prepare and file annual reports related to amounts received from State School Fund for students who are in poverty families.] Directs Department of Education to report to Legislative Assembly on data collected.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to reports on State School Fund expenditures; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 732, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant, Gallegos. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2015-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |