OR HB2965 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct study to determine best method for reducing amount of student debt owed by individuals who graduate from community colleges and public universities. Requires commission to report findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to higher education on or before September 15, 2020. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to higher education; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2965 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2965/Introduced |