OR HB2964 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Human Services to reimburse cost of care provided by specified agencies in amounts sufficient to allow agencies to pay direct support professional 150 percent of state minimum wage. Requires Department of Human Services to reimburse cost of care provided in residential training facilities and residential training homes] by specified agencies in amounts sufficient to allow facilities and homes] agencies to pay direct support professional 150 percent of state minimum wage. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to direct support professionals; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-04-09HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-05HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-17HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-15HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback