OR HB2961 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Homeownership Repair and Rehabilitation Program within Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants to eligible nonprofit organizations to provide financial assistance to persons in low income households for repair and rehabilitation of residences. Delineates program requirements. Establishes Homeownership Repair and Rehabilitation Program Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to department. Appropriates moneys to department to award grants to eligible nonprofit organizations to participate in program. Makes program and fund operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to nonprofit organizations that provide financial assistance to persons in low income households to repair residences; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |