OR HB2957 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Director of Transportation to adopt rules to regulate statewide operation of transportation network companies and to report, on or before September 15, 2022, to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly concerning recommendations for legislation and other measures necessary to improve implementation of oversight over transportation network companies. Directs Director of Transportation to adopt rules to regulate statewide operation of transportation network companies and to report, on or before September 15, 2022, to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly concerning recommendations for legislation and other measures necessary to improve implementation of oversight over transportation network companies. Specifies guidelines for rulemaking. Sunsets January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to transportation network companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2957 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2957/Introduced |