OR HB2952 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new subaccount within State Forestry Department Account. Requires State Forestry Department to deposit revenue received as result of Good Neighbor Authority Agreement project to subaccount. Restricts use of subaccount moneys to support of Good Neighbor Authority Agreement goals.
Title
Relating to the Good Neighbor Authority Agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |