OR HB2950 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to study impacts of COVID-19 on demand for behavioral health services and make recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than September 15, 2022, for legislative changes needed to increase access to behavioral health services for all Oregonians. Requires Oregon Health Authority to study impacts of COVID-19 on demand for behavioral health services and make recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than September 15, 2022, for legislative changes needed to increase access to behavioral health services for all Oregonians. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to behavioral health; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2950 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2950/Introduced |