OR HB2942 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to adopt statewide higher education equity plan and take plan into account in recommending to Governor appropriations for specified programs, facilities and investments and in advising Legislative Assembly, Governor, community colleges, public universities and other state boards and commissions on educational policies. Requires executive director of Higher Education Coordinating Commission to appoint Diversity, Equity and Inclusion Officer.
Title
Relating to access to educational opportunities.
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |