OR HB2938 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Age Discrimination. Establishes Task Force on Age Discrimination. Directs task force to identify and evaluate impacts of age discrimination in workplace and report to interim committees relating to business and labor. Sunsets December 31, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a task force on age discrimination; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |